Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] |
23.06.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] |
31.01.1990 | Change - name/address | published on 21.03.1990 [1990/12] |
22.11.1989 | First examination report | |
31.05.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.07.1988 [1988/29] |
03.03.1988 | Publication of search report | published on 20.04.1988 [1988/16] |
24.01.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.03.1986 [1986/11] |