Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0174004 | Global Dossier | 08.08.1990 | B1 | EP0174004 | 20.04.1988 | A3 | EP0174004 | 12.03.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | DE3530417 | 09.08.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE55423T | 15.08.1990 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | EP85111100 | 03.09.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE55424T | 15.08.1990 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | EP85111101 | 03.09.1985 | DE3530417 | 09.08.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1253775 | 09.05.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | DE3530417 | 09.08.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3530417 | 05.02.1987 | C2 | DE3530417 | 22.05.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3447972 | 04.09.1984 | DE3530417 | 09.08.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3579079D1 | 13.09.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | DE3579079 | 03.09.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3579080D1 | 13.09.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | DE3579080 | 03.09.1985 | DE3530417 | 09.08.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0733309B | 12.04.1995 | B2 | JPS61106488 | 24.05.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | DE3530417 | 09.08.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4708764 | 24.11.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | DE3530417 | 09.08.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4818500 | 04.04.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | DE3530417 | 09.08.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0174003 | Global Dossier | 08.08.1990 | B1 | EP0174003 | 20.04.1988 | A3 | EP0174003 | 12.03.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1253421 | 02.05.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3432467 | 27.03.1986 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0733308B | 12.04.1995 | B2 | JPS6168386 | 08.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5009865 | 23.04.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3432467 | 04.09.1984 |