EP0175238 - Photosensitive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.1988 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PILOT MAN-NEN-HITSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 5-18, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/13] | For all designated states PILOT MAN-NEN-HITSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 5-18, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Hirokazu Pilot Man-Nen-Hitsu K.K. Hiratsuka Factory No. 1-4-3, Nishiyahata Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Igawa, Tatsuya Pilot Man-Nen-Hitsu K.K. Hiratsuka Factory No. 1-4-3, Nishiyahata Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Sato, Morio Pilot Man-Nen-Hitsu K.K. Hiratsuka Factory No. 1-4-3, Nishiyahata Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Anzai, Kazuo Pilot Man-Nen-Hitsu K.K. Hiratsuka Factory No. 1-4-3, Nishiyahata Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1986/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/13] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85111294.6 | 06.09.1985 | [1986/13] | Priority number, date | JP19840188684 | 07.09.1984 Original published format: JP 18868484 | JP19840191280 | 12.09.1984 Original published format: JP 19128084 | JP19850001704 | 09.01.1985 Original published format: JP 170485 | JP19850004736 | 14.01.1985 Original published format: JP 473685 | JP19850045649 | 07.03.1985 Original published format: JP 4564985 | JP19850048007 | 11.03.1985 Original published format: JP 4800785 | JP19850181042 | 20.08.1985 Original published format: JP 18104285 | JP19850185296 | 23.08.1985 Original published format: JP 18529685 | JP19850191255 | 30.08.1985 Original published format: JP 19125585 | [1986/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0175238 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/72 | [1986/13] | CPC: |
G03C1/73 (EP);
G03C1/732 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/13] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliche Zusammensetzung | [1986/13] | English: | Photosensitive composition | [1986/13] | French: | Composition photosensible | [1986/13] | File destroyed: | 11.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/43] | 25.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1988/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |