EP0177771 - Antibiotic A26201-1 and antibiotic A26201-2 produced by a novel strain of Actinoplanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1993 [1993/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whalen, Joseph Wilson 6014 Sturgeon Creek Parkway Midland Michigan 48640 / US | 02 /
Rheaume, Lisa Jill 5112 Dale Street Midland Michigan 48640 / US | 03 /
Swartz, Gregory Lynn 705 Wildes Street Midland Michigan 48640 / US | 04 /
McCoy, Karen Marie 2308 Carol Court Midland Michigan 48640 / US | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/16] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte H.Weickmann Dr. K.Fincke F.A.Weickmann B.Huber Dr. H.Liska Dr. J.Prechtel Dr. B.Böhm, Möhlstrasse 22, Postfach 860 820 W-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85111296.1 | 06.09.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | US19840659912 | 11.10.1984 Original published format: US 659912 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177771 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177771 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177771 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12P1/06, C12N1/20, C07G11/00, A23K1/17, // (C12P1/06, C12R1:045, C12N1:20, C12R1:045) | [1988/10] | CPC: |
C12P1/06 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A23K20/195 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12R2001/045 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12P1/06, C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12P1/06, C12R2001/045 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1988/05] | C12P1/06, C12P1/06, C07G11/00, A23K1/17, // (C12P1/06, C12R1:045, C12N1:20, C12R1:045) | ||
Former IPC [1986/16] | C12N1/20, C12P1/06, C07G11/00, A23K1/17, // (C12P1/06, C12R1:045, C12N1:20, C12R1:045) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/16] | Title | German: | Antibiotika a26201-1 und Antibiotika a26201-2 hergestellt aus einem neuen Actinoplanes-Stamm | [1986/16] | English: | Antibiotic A26201-1 and antibiotic A26201-2 produced by a novel strain of Actinoplanes | [1986/16] | French: | Antibiotique a26201-1 et antibiotique a26201-2 produits par une souche d'actinoplanes | [1986/16] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1986/16: A request for correction has been filed pursuant to Rule 88 EPC. A decision on this request will be taken during the proceedings before the Examining Division | Examination procedure | 05.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 10.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4174390 (HAMILL ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]EP0055070 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [A]EP0055069 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [AD]US4375513 (DEBONO MANUEL, et al) |