blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0180738

EP0180738 - Oxygen cutting machine for pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.1988
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.12.1988 [1988/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH
Hanauer Landstrasse 330
60314 Frankfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/20]For all designated states
MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH
Hanauer Landstrasse 330
D-60314 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Becker, Werner
Wachenheimer Strasse 6
D-6237 Liederbach / DE
02 / Kowalke, Klaus
Am Hasenpfad 18
D-6113 Babenhausen / DE
[1986/20]
Application number, filing date85111328.207.09.1985
[1986/20]
Priority number, dateDE1984343943127.10.1984         Original published format: DE 3439431
[1986/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0180738
Date:14.05.1986
Language:DE
[1986/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0180738
Date:07.01.1988
Language:DE
[1988/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.1986
ClassificationIPC:B23K7/04, B23K7/10, B23K37/02
[1986/20]
CPC:
B23K37/00 (EP); B23K7/10 (EP); B23Q1/48 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1986/20]
TitleGerman:Rohrbrennschneidmaschine[1986/20]
English:Oxygen cutting machine for pipes[1986/20]
French:Machine d'oxycoupage pour des tubes[1986/20]
Examination procedure22.04.1986Examination requested  [1986/26]
20.03.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
09.07.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.1987Fee for grant paid
30.09.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.10.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP5973185  ;
 [A]DE1141514  ;
 [A]DE1463226  ;
 [A]DD103585  ;
 [A]DE2744362  (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH);
 [A]US4229642  (SAKURAI HAJIME, et al);
 [A]DE2918668  (DAIMLER BENZ AG);
 [AD]DE3150971  (KLOECKNER WERKE AG [DE])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 180 (M-318)[1617], 18.August 1984; & JP - A - 59 73185 (NIPPON KOKAN K.K.) 25.04.1984, & JP5973185 A 00000000
 [A]  - TECHNIKA, Nr. 12, 1980, Seiten 1037-1054, Basel, CH; G.W. KÖHLER "Industrie-Roboter"
ExaminationDE2616522
 DE3011256
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.