EP0174630 - Cutting device for the hot granulation of thermoplastic polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1991 [1991/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECNOPART S.r.l. 31, Foro Buonaparte Milan / IT | [1990/27] |
Former [1986/12] | For all designated states Montedison S.p.A. 31, Foro Buonaparte I-20121 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertolotti, Franco 28, Via Adeodato Ressi I-20125 Milan / IT | [1986/12] | Representative(s) | Gudel, Diether, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 D-60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/12] | Gudel, Diether, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 D-60313 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 85111397.7 | 10.09.1985 | [1986/12] | Priority number, date | IT19840022649 | 13.09.1984 Original published format: IT 2264984 | [1986/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0174630 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0174630 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0174630 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/29, B02C18/18 | [1986/12] | CPC: |
B26D1/29 (EP,US);
B26D1/28 (EP,US);
B26D5/02 (EP,US);
B26D7/26 (EP,US);
B26D7/2628 (EP,US);
B29B9/065 (EP,US);
B26D2007/2685 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1986/12] | Title | German: | Warmgranuliervorrichtung für thermoplastische Polymere | [1986/12] | English: | Cutting device for the hot granulation of thermoplastic polymers | [1986/12] | French: | Dispositif pour la granulation chaude de polymères thermoplastiques | [1986/12] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 02.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1092413 (MIDLAND ROSS CORP); | [A]US4009629 (THOMAS JR DORSEY O, et al); | [A]US4019414 (THOMAS JR DORSEY O, et al); | [A]DE3126550 (TEXTIMA VEB K [DD]) |