EP0176825 - Ball hitch for trailers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westfalia-Werke Franz Knöbel & Söhne KG Am Sandberg 45 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states Westfalia-Werke Franz Knöbel & Söhne KG Am Sandberg 45 D-33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Robert-Schumann-Strasse 6 D-4840 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Müller, Gerd, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 D-57072 Siegen / DE | [1986/15] | Application number, filing date | 85111474.4 | 11.09.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | DE19840029103U | 04.10.1984 Original published format: DE 8429103 U | [1986/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176825 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176825 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/06 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
B60D1/06 (EP);
B60D1/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | Kugelkopfkupplung für Anhänger | [1986/15] | English: | Ball hitch for trailers | [1986/15] | French: | Accouplement à rotule pour remorques | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1985 | Examination requested [1986/15] | 21.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2714912 (PETER GONNELLA); | [YD]DE1964974 (BERNDES KARL JOSEF); | [Y]US3679234 (COLLIAU FRANK); | [A]DE7238345U ; | [A]DE2245087 (GRAUBREMSE GMBH) |