EP0175314 - Dosing means for dispensing a flowable material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.09.1988 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/13] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vierkötter, Peter Sperberweg 7 D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | [1986/13] | Application number, filing date | 85111654.1 | 14.09.1985 | [1986/13] | Priority number, date | DE19843434665 | 21.09.1984 Original published format: DE 3434665 | [1986/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0175314 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0175314 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/06 | [1986/13] | CPC: |
B65D47/263 (EP);
B65D83/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/13] | Title | German: | Dosiergerät zum Ausgeben eines rieselfähigen Produkts | [1986/13] | English: | Dosing means for dispensing a flowable material | [1986/13] | French: | Dispositif de dosage pour la distribution d'un produit fluide | [1986/13] | File destroyed: | 11.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 23.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1988/45] | 25.04.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2574166 ; | [X]DE2147550 ; | [A]US2877937 ; | [AD]US3893599 |