EP0179265 - Conductive Thermosetting compositions process for its production and using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/18] | Conductive Thermosetting compositions and process for using same | ||
[1990/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1991 [1991/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. (a Connecticut corp.) Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | ||
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO. Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | ||
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. (a Connecticut corp.) Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | ||
Former [1986/18] | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO. Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Shiow Ching 3525 Angus Valley Trail Ellicott City Maryland 21043 / US | [1986/18] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85111656.6 | 14.09.1985 | [1986/18] | Priority number, date | US19840654140 | 26.09.1984 Original published format: US 654140 | [1986/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0179265 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0179265 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0179265 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/20, C08L63/00, C08L23/00 | [1986/18] | CPC: |
H05K9/0083 (EP,US);
C08G59/18 (EP,US);
C08K3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/18] | Title | German: | Leitfähige hitzehärtbare Zusammensetzungen, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Verwendung | [1990/49] | English: | Conductive Thermosetting compositions process for its production and using same | [1990/49] | French: | Compositions thermodurcissables conductribles, procédé pour leur production et utilisation | [1990/49] |
Former [1986/18] | Leitfähige hitzehärtbare Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zu deren Verwendung | ||
Former [1986/18] | Conductive Thermosetting compositions and process for using same | ||
Former [1986/18] | Compositions thermodurcissables conductribles et procédé pour leur utilisation | Examination procedure | 04.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 26.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3708387 (TURNER D, et al); | [X]GB1315193 (LICENCIA TALALMANYOKAT); | [X]FR2193851 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]DE2501079 (VNI, et al); | [A]EP0099717 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) |