EP0175322 - Hydrophilized membrane of porous hydrophobic material and process for preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/13] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamori, Hisayoshi 38-2, Kiyozumicho 2-chome Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Michio 58-16, Fujigaoka 3-chome Kasugai-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Kawashima, Kazuto 4-1-510, Shinpocho 4-chome Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Hisao 2002, Omori 4-chome Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1986/13] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/13] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85111687.1 | 16.09.1985 | [1986/13] | Priority number, date | JP19840194452 | 17.09.1984 Original published format: JP 19445284 | JP19840238484 | 14.11.1984 Original published format: JP 23848484 | JP19850049140 | 12.03.1985 Original published format: JP 4914085 | [1986/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0175322 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0175322 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0175322 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/04, C08J9/40 | [1986/13] | CPC: |
B01D67/0088 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (KR);
B01D67/0095 (EP,US);
C08J9/40 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S521/918 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249978 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/13] | Title | German: | Hydrophilisiertes Membran aus einem porösen, hydrophoben Material und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1986/13] | English: | Hydrophilized membrane of porous hydrophobic material and process for preparing the same | [1986/13] | French: | Membrane rendue hydrophile à base d'un matériau poreux hydrophobe et son procédé de fabrication | [1986/13] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/23] | 21.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8400015 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]); | [X]DE3043073 (FRESENIUS CHEM PHARM IND [DE]); | [X]FR2440084 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [A]FR2391836 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]); | [A]US4432875 (WRASIDLO WOLFGANG J [US], et al); | [A]FR2121818 (CELANESE CORP); | [A]DE2700512 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) |