EP0175329 - Shaped ceramic article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.1991 [1991/10] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
DE
FR
IT
SE
Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For:BE
DE
FR
IT
SE
Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | |||
Former [1986/13] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Bunsenstrasse 10 D-37073 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claussen, Nils, Dr. Forchenweg 24 D-7151 Leonberg 1 / DE | 02 /
Petzow, Günter, Prof. Dr. Tannenweg 7 D-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 03 /
Nieszery, Katharina Schneidäckerstrasse 57 D-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | 04 /
Panhorst, Wolfgang Lauterenstrasse 46 D-6500 Mainz / DE | 05 /
Weisskopf, Karl-Ludwig Junoweg 3 D-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | [1986/13] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/13] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte H.Weickmann Dr. K.Fincke F.A.Weickmann B.Huber Dr. H.Liska Dr. J.Prechtel Dr. B.Böhm, Möhlstrasse 22, Postfach 860 820 W-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85111694.7 | 16.09.1985 | [1986/13] | Priority number, date | DE19843434077 | 17.09.1984 Original published format: DE 3434077 | DE19843445765 | 14.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3445765 | [1986/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0175329 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0175329 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0175329 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/18, C04B35/80 | [1986/13] | CPC: |
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B35/195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/13] | Title | German: | Keramischer Formkörper | [1986/13] | English: | Shaped ceramic article | [1986/13] | French: | Corps moulé en céramique | [1986/13] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 14.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8402880 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [A]DE2631875 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [AP]WO8500803 (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US]); | [A]EP0027825 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | [A] - CERAMIC ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE PROCEEDINGS, Band 5, Nr. 5/6, Mai-Juni 1984, Seiten 385-396; A.E. PASTO: "Silicon Nitride-Cordierite Composites for Diesel Engine Applications" | [A] - CERAMIC ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE PROCEEDINGS, Band 5, Nr. 7/8, Juli-August 1984, Seiten 513-529; B.A. BENDER et al.: "Electron Microscopy of Ceramic Fiber-Ceramic Matrix Composites-Comparison with Processing and Behavior" | [A] - AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY BULLETIN, Band 63, Nr. 5, Mai 1984, Seiten 705-710; B.H. MUSSLER et al.: "Preparation and Properties of Mullite-Cordierite Composites" |