Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] |
07.05.1988 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.06.1988 [1988/25] |
11.09.1987 | First examination report | |
18.07.1986 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.09.1986 [1986/36] |
17.03.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.04.1986 [1986/18] |