Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3563482D1 | 28.07.1988 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3563482 | 21.09.1985 | DE3439254 | 26.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0179284 | Global Dossier | 22.06.1988 | B1 | EP0179284 | 30.04.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3439254 | 26.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3439254 | 30.04.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3439254 | 26.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS61103134 | 21.05.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3439254 | 26.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4732455 | 22.03.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3439254 | 26.10.1984 |