EP0179284 - Objective mounting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAP Mikrofilm Apparatebau Dr. Poehler GmbH & Co. KG Schulstrasse 2 D-6352 Ober-Mörlen / DE | [1986/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dziemba, Peter Ing. grad. Ahornweg 17 D-6351 Wisselheim / DE | 02 /
Immerheiser, Dieter Rödger weg 68 D-6350 Bad Nauheim / DE | [1986/18] | Representative(s) | Schlagwein, Udo Patentanwalt, Frankfurter Strasse 34 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | Schlagwein, Udo, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Frankfurter Strasse 34 D-61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 85111985.9 | 21.09.1985 | [1986/18] | Priority number, date | DE19843439254 | 26.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3439254 | [1986/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0179284 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0179284 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/04, G03B21/11 | [1986/18] | CPC: |
G03B21/11 (EP,US);
G02B7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/18] | Title | German: | Objektivhalterung | [1986/18] | English: | Objective mounting | [1986/18] | French: | Monture d'objectif | [1986/18] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/36] | 14.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2059105 [ ] (BELL & HOWELL CO); | DE3329003 [ ] (POEHLER MICROFILM APP MAP [DE]); | DE2924739 [ ] (POEHLER MICROFILM APP MAP); | AT353503B [ ] (SCHNEIDER CO OPTISCHE WERKE [DE]); | DE3050314 [ ] (LIESEGANG FA ED [DE]); | DD140294 [ ] (ZEIBIG SIEGFRIED) |