EP0178510 - Device for delivering sand to coasts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1990 [1990/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel, Günter Lange Wenjen 1 D-2800 Bremen 33 / DE | [1986/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | Bruse, Willy Hans Heinrich Edisonstrasse 14 28357 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | Bruse, Willy Hans Heinrich Edisonstrasse 14 D-28357 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112201.0 | 26.09.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | DE19843438204 | 18.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3438204 | [1986/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0178510 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0178510 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178510 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E02B3/04 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
E02B3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Ansandung an Küsten | [1986/17] | English: | Device for delivering sand to coasts | [1986/17] | French: | Dispositif pour l'ensablement sur les côtes | [1986/17] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 01.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2069715 ; | [X]FR1019527 ; | [A]FR2334789 ; | [A]FR2129607 ; | [XP]DE3331563 |