EP0177849 - Top loading swinging bucket centrifuge rotor having knife edge pivots [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cole, Paul Morrison 1213 Hillside Boulevard Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1986/16] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112238.2 | 26.09.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | US19840656645 | 01.10.1984 Original published format: US 656645 | US19840656644 | 01.10.1984 Original published format: US 656644 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177849 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177849 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177849 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B04B5/04 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
B04B5/0421 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/16] | Title | German: | Toplader - Zentrifugenrotor mit Schwenkbechern und mit Schneidlagern | [1989/50] | English: | Top loading swinging bucket centrifuge rotor having knife edge pivots | [1986/16] | French: | Rotor de centrifugeuse à chargement par le haut et à godets pivotants, comportant des supports à couteaux | [1986/16] |
Former [1986/16] | Toplader mit Schwenkbechern vorgesehenen Zentrifugenrotor mit Schneidlagern | Examination procedure | 06.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 18.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0048928 ; | [AD]CH296421 ; | [AD]WO8302242 ; | [AD]US3393864 ; | [A]GB505446 ; | [A]US1997919 |