EP0176972 - Multiprocessor shared pipeline cache memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.1994 [1994/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware / US | ||
Former [1987/44] | For all designated states Honeywell Bull Inc. 3800 W. 80th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55431 / US | ||
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states Honeywell Information Systems Inc. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keeley, James W. 4 Watersedge Drive Hudson, NH 03051 / US | 02 /
Joyce, Thomas F. 11 Old Homestead Rd. Westford, MA 01886 / US | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Bardehle, Heinz, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | Bardehle, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112246.5 | 27.09.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | US19840655473 | 27.09.1984 Original published format: US 655473 | [1986/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0176972 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0176972 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176972 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
G06F12/084 (EP,US);
G06F9/38 (KR);
G06F12/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | Gemeinsam benutzter Mehrprozessor-Pipeline-Cachespeicher | [1986/15] | English: | Multiprocessor shared pipeline cache memory | [1986/15] | French: | Antémémoire pipeline partagée de multiprocesseur | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4169284 (HOGAN SPURGEON G, et al); | [X]US4349871 (LARY RICHARD F); | [A]EP0072179 (HONEYWELL INF SYSTEMS [US]) |