Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
14.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] |
11.07.1988 | First examination report | |
26.01.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.03.1988 [1988/11] |
08.10.1987 | Publication of search report | published on 25.11.1987 [1987/48] |
14.02.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.04.1986 [1986/14] |