EP0177861 - Readhead with reduced height sensitivity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.1990 [1990/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILES INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | For all designated states MILES INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | ||
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states MILES LABORATORIES, INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hernicz, Ralph S. 54427 Faye Drive Osceola Indiana 46561 / US | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Kirchner, Dietrich, et al c/o Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | Kirchner, Dietrich, Dr., et al c/o Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112315.8 | 28.09.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | US19840659416 | 10.10.1984 Original published format: US 659416 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177861 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177861 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177861 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/27, G01N21/25, G01N21/47 | [1986/29] | CPC: |
G01N21/474 (EP,US);
G01N2021/4742 (EP,US);
G01N2021/478 (EP,US);
G01N2201/065 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/16] | G01N21/27, G01N21/25 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/16] | Title | German: | Lesekopf mit verringerter Höhenempfindlichkeit | [1986/16] | English: | Readhead with reduced height sensitivity | [1986/16] | French: | Tête de lecture à sensibilité diminuant avec la hauteur | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1985 | Examination requested [1986/16] | 13.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3497694 (JURA STANISLAV, et al); | [A]US4123172 (FRENCH PARK); | [AD]US4171909 (KRAMER DONALD L [US], et al); | [A]EP0075766 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0102189 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) |