EP0177886 - Flexographic printing machine with several printing units and forme cylinders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1991 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1991 [1991/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher Münsterstrasse 48-52 D-49525 Lengerich / DE | [1986/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ottenhues, Ludger Bergstrasse 15 D-4542 Tecklenburg 2 / DE | 02 /
Wesselmann, Heinz Dörenther-Strasse 4 D-4542 Tecklenburg 2 / DE | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Eduard, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | Lorenz, Eduard Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, et al Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112436.2 | 01.10.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | DE19843437216 | 10.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3437216 | [1986/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177886 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177886 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177886 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B41F5/24, B41F7/24 | [1988/16] | CPC: |
B41F5/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/16] | B41F7/24 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/16] | Title | German: | Flexodruckmaschine mit mehreren Farbwerken und Formzylindern | [1986/16] | English: | Flexographic printing machine with several printing units and forme cylinders | [1986/16] | French: | Machine d'impression flexographique ayant plusieurs unités d'encrage et cylindres imprimeurs | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 17.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2111912 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER); | [Y]US3983808 (JACKSON JOHN MAXWELL) |