EP0177946 - Method of manufacturing separable slide fasteners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshieda, Keiichi 1073, Mikkaichi Kurobe-shi Toyama-ken / JP | 02 /
Sassa, Yuusei 219-2, Takayanagi Namerikawa-shi Toyama-ken / JP | 03 /
Sodeno, Toshiaki 973, Nizayama Nyuzen-machi Shimoniikawa-gun Toyama-ken / JP | 04 /
Miyazaki, Kunio 631-1, Kichijima Uozu-shi Toyama-ken / JP | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/16] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112786.0 | 09.10.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | JP19840211932 | 09.10.1984 Original published format: JP 21193284 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177946 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177946 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177946 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/60 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
A44B19/60 (EP,US);
A44B19/28 (KR);
A44B19/62 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49785 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53291 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53304 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1986/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von trennbaren Reissverschlüssen | [1986/16] | English: | Method of manufacturing separable slide fasteners | [1986/16] | French: | Méthode pour fabriquer des fermetures à glissière du type séparables | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 27.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2112076 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK); | [AD]JPS5850721B ; | [A]EP0099064 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]EP0099065 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]); | [AD]US3081462 (RADOVSKY IRA J, et al) |