Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
12.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1992 [1992/53] |
22.11.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.01.1992 [1992/02] |
23.03.1990 | First examination report | |
14.11.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.01.1990 [1990/01] |
08.06.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 26.07.1989 [1989/30] |
01.03.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.04.1986 [1986/16] |