Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU555810B | Global Dossier | 09.10.1986 | B2 | AU4795585 | 17.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0177946 | Global Dossier | 08.01.1992 | B1 | EP0177946 | 26.07.1989 | A3 | EP0177946 | 16.04.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8505198 | 29.07.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1268931 | 15.05.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3585126D1 | 20.02.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8608826 | 01.09.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2165303 | 13.07.1988 | B | GB2165303 | 09.04.1986 | A | GB8524207D0 | 06.11.1985 | D0 | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK61090 | 17.08.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0128566B | 05.06.1989 | B2 | JPS6190605 | 08.05.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR870000858B | 30.04.1987 | B1 | KR860002987 | 19.05.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY101659 | 31.12.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG59090G | 07.09.1990 | G | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4821396 | 18.04.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21193284 | 09.10.1984 |