EP0177953 - Massage belt with small wooden blocks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.1991 [1991/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adamek-Hetzel, Karl Wolbecker Strasse 84 D-4400 Münster / DE | [1986/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Schulze Horn, Stefan Goldstrasse 50 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Schulze Horn, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. M.Sc. Goldstrasse 50 D-48147 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1986/16] | Patentanwälte Schulze Horn und Hoffmeister Goldstrasse 36 D-48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112818.1 | 10.10.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | DE19843437416 | 12.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3437416 | [1986/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177953 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177953 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177953 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61H11/00 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
A61H15/0092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/16] | Title | German: | Massagegürtel mit rotierbaren Holzklötzen | [1986/16] | English: | Massage belt with small wooden blocks | [1986/16] | French: | Ceinture de massage avec de petits blocs de bois pivotants | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 08.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1700633 (ALLAN HENDRICKSON ABRAM); | [A]FR1197963 ; | [Y]US4157712 (GAYNOR JON E [US]) |