EP0178592 - Intensifying screens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.11.1991 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1991 | Revocation of patent | published on 08.01.1992 [1992/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KASEI OPTONIX, LTD. 12-7, Shibadaimon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1986/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoki, Yuji 424-10, Kamonomiya Odawara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Horiuchi, Hidenaga 3689-3, Kaneko Oi-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Umemoto, Akio 110-8, Kaneko Oi-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Miura, Norio 2-26-11, Sakuradai Isehara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112858.7 | 10.10.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | JP19840216435 | 17.10.1984 Original published format: JP 21643584 | [1986/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0178592 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0178592 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178592 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G21K4/00 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
G21K4/00 (EP,US);
G03C5/17 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/17] | Title | German: | Verstärkungsschirme | [1986/17] | English: | Intensifying screens | [1986/17] | French: | Ecrans intensificateurs | [1986/17] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/17] | 20.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.12.1989
31.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Scheele, Edial François INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02
11.01.1990
31.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | 03
11.01.1990
31.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel (Antwerpen) / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.12.1989
31.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Scheele, Edial François INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
02
11.01.1990
31.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | |||
03
11.01.1990
31.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel (Antwerpen) / BE | |||
Former [1990/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.12.1989
31.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Scheele, Edial François INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 25.04.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.11.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.05.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.08.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.08.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2495818 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [XE]EP0158787 (KASEI OPTONIX [JP]); | [A]EP0088820 (KASEI OPTONIX [JP]); | [A]EP0092240 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0102010 (KASEI OPTONIX [JP]) |