EP0177972 - Fabric finishing composition and process of imparting fabric finish to textile materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.11.1990 [1990/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC. 1525 Howe Street Racine Wisconsin 53403-5011 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC. 1525 Howe Street Racine, Wisconsin 53403-5011 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reichley, Fred J. 3616 Haven Ave. Racine Wisconsin 53405 / US | 02 /
Verburgge, Calvin J. 1031 Ohio Street Racine Wisconsin 53405 / US | 03 /
Villarreal, John G. 101 Perry Ave. Racine Wisconsin 53406 / US | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112935.3 | 11.10.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | US19840659979 | 12.10.1984 Original published format: US 659979 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177972 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177972 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177972 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/263 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
D06M15/263 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/16] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung für die Textilveredelung und Verfahren zum Veredeln von Textilmaterialien | [1986/16] | English: | Fabric finishing composition and process of imparting fabric finish to textile materials | [1986/16] | French: | Composition pour l'apprêt textile et procédé pour appliquer un apprêt à des matériaux textiles | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/09] | 06.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US358573I [ ]; | US4038027 [ ] (KEARNEY JOHN A); | US4240916 [ ] (ROSSI ALBERT [US]) |