EP0218747 - Sense amplifier for amplifying signals on a biased line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Zeghbroeck, Bart Jozef Reidholzstrasse 26A CH-8805 Richterswil / CH | [1987/17] | Representative(s) | Schröder, Otto Heinrich Albrecht, et al IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | Schröder, Otto H., Dr. Ing., et al IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 85113089.8 | 15.10.1985 | [1987/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0218747 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0218747 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/094, G11C7/06, H03K5/02, G11C11/40 | [1987/17] | CPC: |
H03K19/00384 (EP,US);
G11C7/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/17] | Title | German: | Leseverstärker zur Verstärkung von Signalen auf einer vorgespannten Leitung | [1987/17] | English: | Sense amplifier for amplifying signals on a biased line | [1987/17] | French: | Amplificateur de lecture destiné à amplifier les signaux d'une ligne polarisée | [1987/17] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 08.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0142167 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]US3714638 (DINGWALL A, et al); | [A]US4270190 (JINDRA CLIFFORD P, et al); | [A]US4208730 (DINGWALL ANDREW G F [US], et al) |