EP0181516 - Data processing apparatus having efficient min and max functions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Makoto Sumire-Haimu F-goh 5-4-52 Kajigaya Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kuroda, Akihiro 2-501-goh, 1-chome 39-ban Sangenjaya Setagaya-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 03 /
Matsushita, Takeshi 9-24, 6-chome Tsukimino Yamato-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1986/21] | Representative(s) | Jost, Ottokarl IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Jost, Ottokarl, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1989/45] | Barth, Carl Otto IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [1986/21] | Suringar, Willem Joachim Intellectual Property Department IBM Nederland N.V. Watsonweg 2 NL-1423 ND Uithoorn / NL | Application number, filing date | 85113090.6 | 15.10.1985 | [1986/21] | Priority number, date | JP19840238704 | 14.11.1984 Original published format: JP 23870484 | [1986/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0181516 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0181516 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/22 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
G06F7/57 (EP,US);
G06F7/22 (EP,US);
G06F7/544 (EP,US);
G06F9/3001 (EP,US);
G06F9/30021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/21] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungsgerät mit wirtschaftlichen Minimum- und Maximumfunktionen | [1986/21] | English: | Data processing apparatus having efficient min and max functions | [1986/21] | French: | Appareil de traitement de données à fonctions minimum et maximum efficaces | [1986/21] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/02] | 19.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58205253 ; | [A]FR1416562 (CONSTR TELEPHONIQUES) | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-15, no. 5, October 1980, pages 802-808, IEEE, New York, US; F. SATO et al.: "A 400ps bipolar 18 bit RALU using advanced PSA" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 55 (P-260)[1492], 13th March 1984; & JP-A-58 205 253 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 30-11-1983, & JP58205253 A 00000000 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 5, October 1979, pages 2045-2053, New York, US; N.C. BERGLUND et al: "Condition code handling" |