EP0179394 - Radio transmitter identification method, and radio receiver therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Postfach 77 77 77 31132 Hildesheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | For all designated states Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Postfach 77 77 77 D-31132 Hildesheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strauss, Karl-Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Lachnerring 26 D-3200 Hildesheim / DE | [1986/18] | Representative(s) | Eilers, Norbert Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 77 77 77 31132 Hildesheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | Eilers, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys. Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 77 77 77 D-31132 Hildesheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 85113152.4 | 17.10.1985 | [1986/18] | Priority number, date | DE19843439264 | 26.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3439264 | [1986/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0179394 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0179394 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0179394 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H03J7/18 | [1986/18] | CPC: |
H03J1/0083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1986/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Identifikation von Rundfunksendern und Rundfunkgerät hierfür | [1986/18] | English: | Radio transmitter identification method, and radio receiver therefor | [1986/18] | French: | Procédé d'identification d'émetteurs radio et récepteur radio l'utilisant | [1986/18] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/24] | 18.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0150297 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0092055 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]) | [A] - FUNKSCHAU, Nr. 5, März 1982, Seiten 53-56, München, DE; P. BAUER: "Mehr als ein Autoradio" |