Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0179401
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
27.05.1993 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] |
05.06.1992 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] |
15.05.1991 |
Change - representative |
published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] |
12.04.1991 |
First examination report |
|
25.07.1989 |
Publication of search report |
published on 13.09.1989 [1989/37] |
04.03.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.04.1988 [1988/16] |
03.09.1986 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.10.1986 [1986/43] |
17.03.1986 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.04.1986 [1986/18] |