EP0179401 - Dynamically allocated local/global storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brantley, William Cain, Jr. Lakeside Road Mount Kisco New York 10549 / US | 02 /
McAulifee, Kevin Patrick 25 Cross Street Madison New Jersey 07940 / US | 03 /
Norton, Vern Alan 117 Old Post Road South Croton-on-Hudson New York 10520 / US | 04 /
Pfister, Gregory Francis 251 Prince Court Yorktown Heights New York 10598 / US | 05 /
Weiss, Joseph 295 Edgewood Avenue Teaneck New Jersey 07666 / US | [1986/18] | Representative(s) | Killgren, Neil Arthur IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Killgren, Neil Arthur IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1988/16] | Grant, Iain Murray IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1986/18] | Lewis, Alan John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 85113174.8 | 17.10.1985 | [1986/18] | Priority number, date | US19840664131 | 24.10.1984 Original published format: US 664131 | [1986/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0179401 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0179401 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0179401 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02, G06F12/06 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
G06F12/0292 (EP,US);
G06F12/02 (KR);
G06F12/0692 (EP,US);
G06F12/08 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1986/18] | G06F12/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/18] | Title | German: | Dynamisch zugeordnete lokale/globale Speicheranordnung | [1986/18] | English: | Dynamically allocated local/global storage system | [1986/18] | French: | Système de mémoire locale/globale attribuée dynamiquement | [1986/18] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.07.1992 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 22.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3796996 (CURLEY J, et al); | [AD]US3820079 (HAMILTON J, et al) | [A] - THE 8TH ANNUAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 12th-14th May 1981, pages 3-19, IEEE, New York, US; B.W. ARDEN et al.: "MP/C: A multiprocessor/computer architecture" |