EP0203221 - Device for lying down on the ground [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.1988 [1988/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hobi, Bernadette Röhrliberg 54 CH-6330 Cham / CH | [1986/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/49] | Representative(s) | Kemény, Andreas c/o Kemény AG Patentanwaltbüro Postfach 3414 CH-6002 Luzern / CH | [1986/49] | Application number, filing date | 85113323.1 | 21.10.1985 | [1986/49] | Priority number, date | CH19850002287 | 30.05.1985 Original published format: CH 228785 | [1986/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0203221 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0203221 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A47G9/06 | [1986/49] | CPC: |
A47G9/06 (EP);
E04H15/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Liegen auf dem Boden | [1986/49] | English: | Device for lying down on the ground | [1986/49] | French: | Dispositif pour s'étendre sur le sol | [1986/49] | File destroyed: | 11.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/39] | 02.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.02.1988 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2907057 ; | [X]US2898609 ; | [A]US3241202 ; | [A]US3237904 |