Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1990 [1990/33] |
15.07.1989 | (Expected) grant | published on 30.08.1989 [1989/35] |
14.07.1989 | Change - representative | published on 30.08.1989 [1989/35] |
20.07.1988 | First examination report | |
12.07.1988 | Change - representative | published on 31.08.1988 [1988/35] |
13.04.1988 | Change - applicant | published on 01.06.1988 [1988/22] |
16.09.1986 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.11.1986 [1986/45] |
31.05.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.07.1986 [1986/29] |