Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0187211 | Global Dossier | 30.08.1989 | B1 | EP0187211 | 16.07.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP22837184 | 30.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3572743D1 | 05.10.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP22837184 | 30.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0631968B | 27.04.1994 | B2 | JPS61107298 | 26.05.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22837184 | 30.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4815354 | 28.03.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22837184 | 30.10.1984 |