EP0187211 - Tone signal generating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1990 [1990/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | ||
Former [1986/29] | For all designated states Nippon Gakki Seizo Kabushiki Kaisha 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunimoto, Toshifumi c/o NIPPON GAKKI SEIZO K.K. 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1986/29] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Günther, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/35] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte HAGEMANN & KEHL Ismaninger Strasse 108 Postfach 860329 D-8000 München 86 / DE | ||
Former [1986/29] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85113670.5 | 28.10.1985 | [1986/29] | Priority number, date | JP19840228371 | 30.10.1984 Original published format: JP 22837184 | [1986/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0187211 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0187211 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G10H7/00 | [1986/29] | CPC: |
G10H7/008 (EP,US);
G10H1/125 (EP,US);
G10H2250/621 (EP,US);
G10H2250/631 (EP,US);
Y10S84/09 (EP,US);
Y10S84/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1986/29] | Title | German: | Tonsignalerzeugungsvorrichtung | [1986/29] | English: | Tone signal generating apparatus | [1986/29] | French: | Dispositif générateur de signal sonore | [1986/29] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/45] | 25.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4138915 (NAGAI YOHEI, et al); | [Y]GB2103005 (NIPPON MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS MFG [JP]); | [A]US4267761 (DEUTSCH RALPH) |