EP0220334 - Draft support for use at writing, drawing, video display spots and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.1989 [1989/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sträter, Fritz Unterm Bamberg 1 D-58540 Meinerzhagen / DE | [1987/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Köchling, Conrad, et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | Köchling, Conrad, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135 D-58097 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85113678.8 | 28.10.1985 | [1987/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0220334 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220334 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A47B27/18 | [1987/19] | CPC: |
F16M11/2092 (EP,US);
A47B27/18 (EP,US);
F16M11/10 (EP,US);
F16M11/2021 (EP,US);
F16M11/24 (EP,US);
F16M2200/044 (EP,US);
F16M2200/063 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/19] | Title | German: | Konzepthalter zur Anwendung an Schreib-, Zeichen-, Bildschirmarbeitsplätzen und dgl. | [1987/19] | English: | Draft support for use at writing, drawing, video display spots and the like | [1987/19] | French: | Support de feuilles, accessoire de bureau, de planche à dessin, d'écran ou similaire | [1987/19] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1986 | Examination requested [1987/19] | 22.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US1460697 (BENDLIN ALFRED W); | [Y]FR895337 ; | [Y]US1956546 (FROELICH GEORGE E); | [Y]DE339415 (WAGNER HEINRICH) |