EP0184653 - Running-up method and apparatus for starting a rotative frequence converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1987/41] |
Former [1986/25] | For all designated states BBC Aktiengesellschaft Brown, Boveri & Cie. Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruggisser, Walter Leo Schönbühlstrasse 33 CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | 02 /
Knaffl, Berislav Lindenhof 25 Ch-5430 Wettingen / CH | 03 /
Schäfer, René Gerstenweg 7 CH-5034 Suhr / CH | [1986/25] | Application number, filing date | 85113681.2 | 28.10.1985 | [1986/25] | Priority number, date | DE19843445417 | 13.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3445417 | [1986/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0184653 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0184653 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184653 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/34, H02P9/00 | [1986/25] | CPC: |
H02P9/08 (EP);
H02J3/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI, SE [1986/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Hochlaufeinrichtung zum Hochfahren eines rotierenden Frequenzumformers | [1986/25] | English: | Running-up method and apparatus for starting a rotative frequence converter | [1986/25] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'accélération pour mettre en marche un convertisseur de fréquence rotatif | [1986/25] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 29.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1937498 (HERMAN BANY, et al); | [A]DE1488978 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]DE2062853 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]EP0026374 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [AD] - TECHN. MITT. AEG-TELEFUNKEN, Band 63, Nr. 7, 1973, Seiten 249-253; H. BETZ: "Der Netzkupplungsumformer Neu-Ulm, eine Anlage zur Stromversorgung der Deutschen Bundesbahn" | Examination | - Techn. Mitt. AEG-Telefunken 63 (1973), S. 273-278 |