EP0180181 - Hand scanner input system and a sheet used in hand scanner input system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishigaki, Toshinori c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1986/19] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85113694.5 | 28.10.1985 | [1986/19] | Priority number, date | JP19840228510 | 30.10.1984 Original published format: JP 22851084 | [1986/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0180181 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0180181 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180181 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/10, H04N1/04 | [1988/05] | CPC: |
H04N1/1072 (EP,US);
G06V10/88 (KR);
G06K7/10 (KR);
H04N1/047 (EP,US);
H04N1/107 (EP,US);
H04N1/1911 (EP,US);
H04N2201/02425 (EP,US);
H04N2201/02439 (EP,US);
H04N2201/03162 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0414 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0422 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0426 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04703 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0471 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0472 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04727 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04729 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04731 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04732 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04734 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04749 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04787 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04789 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04791 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04794 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1986/19] | H04N1/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1986/19] | Title | German: | Handabtasteingabevorrichtung und in einer Handabtasteingabevorrichtung benutztes Blatt | [1986/19] | English: | Hand scanner input system and a sheet used in hand scanner input system | [1986/19] | French: | Système d'entrée par balayage manuel et feuille utilisée dans un système d'entrée par balayage manuel | [1986/19] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 28.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57007674 ; | [A]JP56120264 ; | [A]US4216378 (MONETTE WILLIAM A [US]); | [A]GB2098348 (LEWIS JOHN) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 67 (E-104)[945], 28th April 1982; & JP-A-57 007 674 (MATSUSHITA DENSOU KIKI K.K.) 14-01-1982, & JP57007674 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 198 (E-87)[870], 16th December 1981; & JP-A-56 120 264 (CANON K.K.) 21-09-1981, & JP56120264 A 00000000 |