EP0183982 - Photographic paper accommodating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kogane, Mikio FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 798 Miyanodai Kaisei-cho Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Kenji FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 798 Miyanodai Kaisei-cho Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258 / JP | 03 /
Kitoh, Eiichi FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 798 Miyanodai Kaisei-cho Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258 / JP | 04 /
Kubota, Kazufumi FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 798 Miyanodai Kaisei-cho Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258 / JP | 05 /
Tokuda, Kanji FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 798 Miyanodai Kaisei-cho Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258 / JP | [1986/24] | Representative(s) | Fuhlendorf, Jörn, et al Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | Fuhlendorf, Jörn, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dreiss, Hosenthien & Fuhlendorf Gerokstrasse 6 D-70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 85113755.4 | 29.10.1985 | [1986/24] | Priority number, date | JP19840230977 | 01.11.1984 Original published format: JP 23097784 | [1986/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0183982 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0183982 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G03D13/00 | [1986/24] | CPC: |
G03D13/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1986/24] | Title | German: | Ausgleichsgerät für photographisches Papier | [1986/24] | English: | Photographic paper accommodating apparatus | [1986/24] | French: | Appareil d'accommodation de papier photographique | [1986/24] | Examination procedure | 23.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 14.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3873012 (WICK RICHARD, et al); | [A]US3575331 (MIDDLEMAN DAVID); | [A]US4041819 (CHU PAUL, et al); | [A]GB1575041 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [A]GB1465612 (SUNDWIGER EISEN MASCHINEN) |