EP0180216 - Process for production of lactam copolymer and of articles therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/19] | Process for production of lactam copolymer, the copolymer and article | ||
[1992/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken 755-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | For all designated states UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishiyama, Masao c/o Ube Industries, Ltd. Hirakata Laboratory 3-10, Nakamiyakita-machi Hirakata-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Hirano, Yasuo c/o Ube Industries, Ltd. Hirakata Laboratory 3-10, Nakamiyakita-machi Hirakata-shi Osaka / JP | [1986/19] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85113837.0 | 30.10.1985 | [1986/19] | Priority number, date | JP19840226941 | 30.10.1984 Original published format: JP 22694184 | [1986/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0180216 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0180216 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180216 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/16, C08J5/00 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
C08G69/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08G69/18 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1986/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung vom Lactamcopolymer und von Gegenständen daraus | [1992/21] | English: | Process for production of lactam copolymer and of articles therefrom | [1992/21] | French: | Procédé pour la production de copolymères de lactame et d'articles en celui-ci | [1992/21] |
Former [1986/19] | Verfahren zur Herstellung vom Lactamcopolymer, das Copolymer und Gegenstände daraus | ||
Former [1986/19] | Process for production of lactam copolymer, the copolymer and article | ||
Former [1986/19] | Procédé pour la production de copolymère de lactame, le copolymère et article en celui-ci | Examination procedure | 08.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 20.05.1992 | [1992/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP52057294 ; | [A]JP51060293 ; | [AP]JP59213723 ; | [A]JP59093726 ; | [A]EP0088560 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 87, no. 12, 19th September 1977, abstract no. 85773y, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. MATSUO et al.: "Impact-resistant block copolyamides", & JP - A - 52 057 294 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING) (Cat. D), & JP52057294 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 85, no. 14, 4th October 1976, page 33, abstract no. 95135q, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. MATSUO et al.: "Impact-resistant polyamides", & JP - A - 51 060 293 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING) (Cat. D), & JP51060293 A 00000000 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 78 (C-274)[1801], 6th April 1985; & JP - A - 59 213 723 (MITSUI SEKIYU KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 03-12-1984, & JP59213723 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 205 (C-243)[1642], 19th September 1984; & JP - A - 59 093 726 (UBE KOSAN K.K.) 30-05-1984, & JP59093726 A 00000000 |