EP0182166 - Process for preparing phenylisopropylurea compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.04.1991 [1991/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singh, Balwant 93 Janes Lane Stamford, CT 06903 / US | 02 /
Waterman, Paul Sheldon 15 Joseph Court Shelton, CT 06484 / US | [1989/22] |
Former [1986/22] | 01 /
Singh, Balwant 93 Janes Lane Stamford Connecticut 06903 / US | ||
02 /
Waterman, Paul Sheldon 15 Joseph Court Shelton Connecticut 06484 / US | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85113939.4 | 02.11.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | US19840672038 | 16.11.1984 Original published format: US 672038 | [1986/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0182166 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0182166 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182166 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C127/19 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
C07C273/1854 (EP,US);
C07C273/1863 (KR);
C07C273/189 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C273/1854, C07C275/28 (EP,US);
C07C273/1854, C07C275/30 (US,EP);
C07C273/1854, C07C275/34 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Phenylisopropylharnstoffderivaten | [1986/22] | English: | Process for preparing phenylisopropylurea compounds | [1986/22] | French: | Procédé de préparation de dérivés de phénylisopropylurée | [1986/22] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.11.1989 | BE | 30.11.1989 | [1991/16] |
Former [1990/42] | GB | 02.11.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2849485 (MASSIE GEORGE M) |