EP0185897 - Method for the treatment of packing material and the material treated accordingly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1988 [1988/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB Tetra Pak Box 61 221 00 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states AB TETRA PAK Box 61 S-221 00 Lund / SE | ||
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states Tetra Pak International AB P.O. Box 61 S-221 00 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niske, Jörgen Östra Vallgatan 1 S-223 61 Lund / SE | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61 D-80085 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85113977.4 | 04.11.1985 | [1986/27] | Priority number, date | SE19840005539 | 05.11.1984 Original published format: SE 8405539 | [1986/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185897 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185897 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B31B1/74, B65D5/56, B23C3/13 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
B24B19/223 (EP,US);
B31B50/14 (KR);
B24B1/00 (EP,US);
B31F7/00 (KR);
B65D5/4266 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1303 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24215 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24264 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24455 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24934 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Verpackungsmaterial und das dementsprechend behandelte Material | [1986/27] | English: | Method for the treatment of packing material and the material treated accordingly | [1986/27] | French: | Procédé de traitement de matériel d'emballage et le matériel ainsi traité | [1986/27] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2996238 [ ] (LINDE ROBERT E) |