EP0183096 - Membrane unit for electrolytic cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beaver, Richard Neal 10 Forest Lane Angleton Texas 77515 / US | [1986/23] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/23] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte H.Weickmann Dr. K.Fincke F.A.Weickmann B.Huber Dr. H.Liska Dr. J.Prechtel Dr. B.Böhm, Möhlstrasse 22, Postfach 860 820 W-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114059.0 | 05.11.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | US19840668043 | 05.11.1984 Original published format: US 668043 | [1986/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0183096 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0183096 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0183096 | Date: | 19.08.1991 | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C25B13/00, C25B9/00 | [1986/23] | CPC: |
C25B9/75 (EP);
C25B13/08 (EP);
C25B9/77 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/23] | Title | German: | Membranelement für elektrolytische Zelle | [1986/23] | English: | Membrane unit for electrolytic cell | [1986/23] | French: | Elément de membrane pour cellule électrolytique | [1986/23] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/23] | 25.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2013242 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]FR1540964 (MONSANTO CO); | [A]EP0051380 ; | [A]DE2821983 (HOOKER CHEMICALS PLASTICS CORP) | Examination | FR2146602 | EP0066938 |