EP0180966 - Inverter with a charge which forces the output voltage of the inverter into a particular frequency and curve form [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1991 [1991/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25, Postfach 1555 D-63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25, Postfach 1555 D-63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1986/20] | For all designated states Leybold-Heraeus GmbH Bonner Strasse 504 Postfach 51 07 60 D-5000 Köln 51 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, Friedrich-Werner, Dr.-Ing. Schwarzwaldweg 2 D-6460 Gelnhausen / DE | 02 /
Thorn, Gernot, Dipl.-Ing. Posener Strasse 8 D-6450 Hanau am Main 1 / DE | 03 /
Dahlinger, Dietrich, Prof. Mittenmayerweg 7 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
Sperzel, Wolfgang, Ing. Heimatfriederg. 3 D-6460 Gelnhausen / DE | 05 /
Hubertus, Guido, Ing. Portlandstrasse 20 D-6500 Mainz / DE | 06 /
Stürmer, Johann, Ing. Pestalozzistrasse 8 D-6465 Freigericht 1 / DE | [1986/20] | Representative(s) | Schickedanz, Willi Langener Strasse 68 63073 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/20] | Schickedanz, Willi, Dipl.-Ing. Langener Strasse 68 D-63073 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114077.2 | 05.11.1985 | [1986/20] | Priority number, date | DE19843441000 | 09.11.1984 Original published format: DE 3441000 | DE19843441001 | 09.11.1984 Original published format: DE 3441001 | [1986/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0180966 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0180966 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180966 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/523 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
H02M7/527 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/20] | Title | German: | Wechselrichter mit einer Last, die eine Wechselrichter-Ausgangsspannung bestimmter Kurvenform und Frequenz erzwingt | [1986/20] | English: | Inverter with a charge which forces the output voltage of the inverter into a particular frequency and curve form | [1986/20] | French: | Onduleur avec une charge qui force la tension de sortie de l'onduleur à une fréquence et une tension déterminée | [1986/20] | Examination procedure | 08.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 13.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1593372 ; | [A]FR2228318 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL [GB]); | [A]FR2146059 (GEN ELECTRIC) | [AD] - ETZ, Band 104, Heft 24, 1983, Seiten 1246-1251; W. BÖSTERLING et al.: "Thyristorarten ASCR, RLT und GTO - Technik und Grenzen ihrer Anwendung" | [AD] - ETZ, Band 104, Heft 24, 1983, Seiten 1252-1255; R. BRAUKMEIER: "Zwischen Transistor und Thyristor - Der GTO-Thyristor" |