EP0181602 - Gas bottle for tritium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | [1986/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fabian, Hans Johann, Dr. Kommstrasse 29 D-5170 Jülich / DE | 02 /
Patay, Jenö Christinastrasse 14 D-5170 Jülich / DE | [1986/21] | Application number, filing date | 85114127.5 | 06.11.1985 | [1986/21] | Priority number, date | DE19843440632 | 07.11.1984 Original published format: DE 3440632 | [1986/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0181602 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0181602 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F17C1/00, F17C13/12 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
F17C13/123 (EP);
G21F5/002 (EP);
G21F5/015 (EP);
F17C2203/0391 (EP);
F17C2209/232 (EP);
F17C2227/045 (EP);
F17C2260/038 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/21] | Title | German: | Gasflasche für Tritium | [1986/21] | English: | Gas bottle for tritium | [1986/21] | French: | Bouteille à gaz pour tritium | [1986/21] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 03.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/48] | 23.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.07.1989 | FR | 12.07.1989 | GB | 12.07.1989 | IT | 12.07.1989 | NL | 12.07.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 12.07.1989 | |
GB | 12.07.1989 | ||
IT | 12.07.1989 | ||
NL | 12.07.1989 | ||
Former [1991/12] | BE | 12.07.1989 | |
GB | 12.07.1989 | ||
NL | 12.07.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | GB | 12.07.1989 | |
NL | 12.07.1989 | ||
Former [1990/12] | NL | 12.07.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1292972 ; | [X]DE1300745 ; | [A]FR2080192 ; | [A]US4177863 |