Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
14.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.1993 [1993/40] |
28.08.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] |
19.08.1992 | Change - applicant | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] |
05.09.1990 | First examination report | |
27.06.1988 | Publication of search report | published on 17.08.1988 [1988/33] |
12.01.1987 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.03.1987 [1987/10] |
28.03.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.05.1986 [1986/20] |