EP0185909 - 5-Alkyl-1-phenyl-2-piperazino alkylpyrazolin-3-one compounds as well as processes and intermediates for their preparation and medicaments containing these compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kali-Chemie Pharma GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | [1986/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jasserand, Daniel 2 Allée d'Andrezieux F-75018 Paris / FR | 02 /
Christen, Marie-Odile 240 Rue du Faubourg St. Honoré F-75008 Paris / FR | 03 /
Biard, Dominique 21 La Butte Eglantine F-95160 Eragny / FR | 04 /
Yavordios, Dimitri 536 Avenue Dubanchet F-01400 Chatillon s/Chalaronne / FR | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Lauer, Dieter c/o Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr. c/o Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114466.7 | 14.11.1985 | [1986/27] | Priority number, date | DE19843442860 | 24.11.1984 Original published format: DE 3442860 | [1986/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185909 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185909 | Date: | 21.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/22, C07D401/12, C07D498/04, A61K31/495, // (C07D498/04, 265:00, 231:00) | [1986/27] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07D231/22 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/27] | Title | German: | 5-Alkyl-1-phenyl-2-piperazinoalkylpyrazolin-3-on-Verbindungen sowie Verfahren und Zwischenprodukte zu ihrer Herstellung und diese Verbindungen enthaltende Arzneimittel | [1986/27] | English: | 5-Alkyl-1-phenyl-2-piperazino alkylpyrazolin-3-one compounds as well as processes and intermediates for their preparation and medicaments containing these compounds | [1986/27] | French: | Composés de 5-alkyl-1-phényl-2-pipérazinoalkylpyrazolin-3-one ainsi que procédés et produits intermédiaires pour leur préparation et médicaments comprenant ces composés | [1986/27] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/03] | 20.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.1990 | SE | 15.11.1990 | [1992/15] |
Former [1991/35] | SE | 15.11.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3362956 (SYDNEY ARCHER); | [A]GB1473000 (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI); | [A]EP0072960 (KALI CHEMIE PHARMA GMBH [DE]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 98, Nr. 9, 28. Februar 1983, Seite 625, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassungsnr. 72018h, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. UEDA et al.: "Synthesis of pyrazolone derivatives. XLII. Synthesis and analgesic activity of 2-methyl-1-phenyl-6,7-dihydro-1H, 5H-pyrazolo[5,1-b][1,3]oxazin-8-ium bromide", & YAKUGAKU ZASSHI 1982, 102(8), 743-747. In Verbindung mit CHEMICAL SUBSTANCE, INDEX, Band 98, 1983, Seite 6053CS, Spalte 2, Zeilen 83, 84; 3H-Pyrazol-3-one, 1,2-dihydro-2-(3-hydroxypropyl)-5-methyl-1-phenyl; Seite 6056CS, Spalte 1, Zeilen 73-77, 5H-Pyrazolo[5,1-b][1.3]oxazinium, 6,7-dihydro-2-methyl-1-phenyl-bromide, 72018h, und -iodide | [A] - HOUBEN-WEYL "Methoden der Organischen Chemie", Band XI/1, Stickstoffverbindungen II, 4. Auflage, Seiten 108-111, Georg Thieme Verlag, Stuttgart; H. GLASER et al.: "Amine 1. Herstellung" | Examination | - C.J. ESTLER (Hrsg.) Lehrbuch der allgemeinen und systematischen Pharmakologie und Toxikologie, Verlag F.K. Schattauer 1983, S.74,77,78,81,83. |