EP0182295 - Dusting powder compositions containing modified starch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CPC INTERNATIONAL INC. International Plaza P.O. Box 8000 Englewood Cliffs New Jersey 07632-9976 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | For all designated states CPC INTERNATIONAL INC. International Plaza P.O. Box 8000 Englewood Cliffs New Jersey 07632-9976 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adams, Heidi 2114 Wesley Berwyn Illinois 60402 / US | 02 /
Kochan, David A. 1534-77th Street Darien Illinois 60559 / US | 03 /
Zobel, Henry F. 1105 Belair Drive Darien Illinois 60559 / US | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/22] | Lederer, Franz, Dr. Lederer, Keller & Riederer, Patentanwälte, Lucile-Grahn-Strasse 22 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114490.7 | 14.11.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | US19840671712 | 15.11.1984 Original published format: US 671712 | [1986/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0182295 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0182295 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/035, C08B30/12 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
A61K8/732 (EP);
A61Q1/12 (EP);
C08B30/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/22] | Title | German: | Körperpuder welche modifizierte Stärke enthalten | [1986/22] | English: | Dusting powder compositions containing modified starch | [1986/22] | French: | Poudres pour les soins du corps contenant de l'amidon modifié | [1986/22] | File destroyed: | 11.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 03.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/43] | 30.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.03.1988 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4237619 ; | [AD]US2852404 ; | [AP]EP0134121 ; | [A]DE1047382 ; | [AD]US3967975 |