EP0183173 - 3,5-dialkyl-4,6-diaryl-tetrahydro-2H-1,3,5-thiadiazine-2-thione derivative, process for its production and antihyperlipidemic agent containing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 3-7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 3-7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujikawa, Yoshihiro 7-2-404, Narashinodai 3-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Sakashita, Mitsuaki, c/o Nissan Kagaku Kogyo Urawa-ryo, 14-3, Ryoke 1-chome Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Tsuruzoe, Nobutomo 28-2, Higashi 5-chome Kuki-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1990/23] |
Former [1986/23] | 01 /
Fujikawa, Yoshihiro 7-2-404, Narashinodai 3-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Sakashita, Mitsuaki Nissan Kagaku Kogyo Urawa-ryo 14-3, Ryoke 1-chome Urawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Tsuruzoe, Nobutomo 28-2, Higashi 5-chome Kuki-shi Saitama-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114710.8 | 19.11.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | JP19840254921 | 30.11.1984 Original published format: JP 25492184 | [1986/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0183173 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0183173 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0183173 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D285/34, C07D405/14, A61K31/54 | [1986/23] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
C07D285/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/23] | Title | German: | 3,5-Dialkyl-4,6-diaryl-tetrahydro-2H-1,3,5-thiadiazin-2-thion-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und sie enthaltende antihyperlipidemische Mittel | [1986/23] | English: | 3,5-dialkyl-4,6-diaryl-tetrahydro-2H-1,3,5-thiadiazine-2-thione derivative, process for its production and antihyperlipidemic agent containing it | [1986/23] | French: | Dérivés de 3,5-dialkyl-4,6-diaryl-tétrahydro-2H-1,3,5-thiadiazine-2-thione, procédé pour leur préparation et agents antihyperlipidémiques les contenant | [1986/23] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 01.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.1990 | BE | 06.06.1990 | CH | 06.06.1990 | FR | 06.06.1990 | IT | 06.06.1990 | LI | 06.06.1990 | NL | 06.06.1990 | SE | 06.06.1990 | LU | 30.11.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 06.06.1990 | |
BE | 06.06.1990 | ||
CH | 06.06.1990 | ||
IT | 06.06.1990 | ||
LI | 06.06.1990 | ||
NL | 06.06.1990 | ||
SE | 06.06.1990 | ||
FR | 26.10.1990 | ||
LU | 30.11.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 06.06.1990 | |
BE | 06.06.1990 | ||
CH | 06.06.1990 | ||
IT | 06.06.1990 | ||
LI | 06.06.1990 | ||
NL | 06.06.1990 | ||
SE | 06.06.1990 | ||
FR | 26.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/39] | AT | 06.06.1990 | |
BE | 06.06.1990 | ||
CH | 06.06.1990 | ||
LI | 06.06.1990 | ||
NL | 06.06.1990 | ||
SE | 06.06.1990 | ||
FR | 26.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/29] | AT | 06.06.1990 | |
BE | 06.06.1990 | ||
CH | 06.06.1990 | ||
LI | 06.06.1990 | ||
NL | 06.06.1990 | ||
SE | 06.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/24] | BE | 06.06.1990 | |
CH | 06.06.1990 | ||
LI | 06.06.1990 | ||
NL | 06.06.1990 | ||
SE | 06.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/18] | CH | 06.06.1990 | |
LI | 06.06.1990 | ||
NL | 06.06.1990 | ||
SE | 06.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/12] | CH | 06.06.1990 | |
LI | 06.06.1990 | ||
SE | 06.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/09] | CH | 06.06.1990 | |
LI | 06.06.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4202832 (FISCHER ULF [CH], et al); | [XP]EP0135109 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) |