EP0182376 - Device for controlling shift in automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. No.2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama City / JP | [1986/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Yasushi No. 1484-13, Kosugaya-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama City / JP | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/22] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114752.0 | 21.11.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | JP19840245879 | 22.11.1984 Original published format: JP 24587984 | JP19840255813 | 05.12.1984 Original published format: JP 25581384 | JP19840255814 | 05.12.1984 Original published format: JP 25581484 | [1986/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0182376 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0182376 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182376 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/06 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W10/11 (EP,US);
B60W10/115 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
B60W30/1819 (EP,US);
F16H61/061 (EP,US);
F16H2059/6807 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0078 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0255 (EP,US);
F16H59/46 (EP,US);
F16H61/14 (EP,US);
F16H63/502 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für Schaltbesteuerung in einem automatischen Getriebe | [1986/22] | English: | Device for controlling shift in automatic transmission | [1986/22] | French: | Dispositif de commande de changement de rapport dans une transmission automatique | [1986/22] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/22] | 27.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3205767 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]FR2417689 (BERLIET AUTOMOBILES [FR]); | [A]EP0001298 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4102222 (MILLER ALAN LEONARD, et al); | [A]GB2058255 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]US4148231 (REDZINSKI GILBERT E) |